Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to amend the Social Security Act with respect to food stamp purchases by welfare recipients.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1954 with respect to influencing legislation by public charities.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/21/1976Public law 94-585.
10/21/1976Signed by President.
10/13/1976Measure presented to President.
10/01/1976Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendments.
10/01/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
09/29/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance with amendment, S. Rept. 94-1345.
06/08/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #339 (355-14).
06/02/1976Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means with amendment, H. Rept. 94-1210.
05/03/1976Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/21/1976Public law 94-585.
10/21/1976Signed by President.
10/13/1976HouseMeasure presented to President.
10/12/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
10/08/1976Measure enrolled in House.
10/01/1976HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendments.
10/01/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
10/01/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
10/01/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
09/29/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Finance with amendment, S. Rept. 94-1345.
06/10/1976SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Finance.
06/08/1976HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #339 (355-14).
06/08/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
06/08/1976HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
06/02/1976HouseReported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means with amendment, H. Rept. 94-1210.
05/03/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
05/03/1976HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/03/1976 Referred to
06/02/1976 Reported by H.Rept 94-1210
Senate Finance06/10/1976 Referred to
09/29/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-1345

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.13500. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/01/1976)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Amends the Social Security Act to make public assistance Withholding procedures optional (formerly required) for any State plan for aid and services to needy families with children where a recipient household requests that such procedures be utilized. Requires States, on or after June 30, 1977, to pass through cost-of-living increases to recipients of Supplemental Security Income benefits.