Summary: H.R.14114 — 94th Congress (1975-1976)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (06/30/1976)

(Measure passed Senate)

Increase the public debt limit for the period from July 1, 1976, through September 30, 1976, by $236,000,000,000; for the period from October 1, 1976, through March 31, 1977, by $282,000,000,000; and for the period from April 1, 1977, through September 30, 1977, by $300,000,000,000.

Increases the limitation from $12,000,000,000 to $17,000,000,000 on the amount of long-term bonds that may be issued bearing interest above the 4 and 1/4 percent statutory ceiling.