Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to make permanent the existing temporary authority for reimbursement of States for interim assistance payments under title XVI of the Social Security Act, to extend for 1 year the eligibility of supplemental security income recipients for food stamps, and to extend for 1 year the period during which payments may be made to States for child support collection services under part D of title IV of such act.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
07/14/1976Public law 94-365.
07/14/1976Signed by President.
07/06/1976Measure presented to President.
07/02/1976Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate receded from its amendments.
07/01/1976Resolving differences -- House actions: House disagreed to Senate amendment.
06/30/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
06/28/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
06/24/1976Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means, H. Rept. 94-1296.
06/22/1976Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/14/1976Public law 94-365.
07/14/1976Signed by President.
07/06/1976HouseMeasure presented to President.
07/06/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
07/06/1976Measure enrolled in House.
07/02/1976SenateSenate receded from its amendments.
07/01/1976HouseHouse disagreed to Senate amendment.
06/30/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
06/30/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/30/1976SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
06/28/1976HouseMeasure passed House.
06/28/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
06/28/1976HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
06/24/1976HouseReported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means, H. Rept. 94-1296.
06/22/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/22/1976HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/22/1976 Referred to
06/24/1976 Reported by H.Rept 94-1296

No related bill information was received for H.R.14484.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.14484. View summaries

Shown Here:
Senate receded and concurred with amendment (07/02/1976)

(Senate receded from its amendments)

Makes permanent the existing temporary authority under the Supplemental Income program of Title II of the Social Security Act for interim assistance payments to States to individuals while the applications of such individuals for supplemental security income are pending.

Extends for one year, until June 30, 1977, the eligibility of supplemental security income recipients for food stamps.

Extends for one year, until June 30, 1977, the period during which payments may be made for child support collection services and paternity determination services under the Aid to Families with Dependent Children program of Title IV of the Social Security Act.