Summary: H.R.14674 — 94th Congress (1975-1976)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.14674. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/01/1976)

Agenda for Government Reform Act - Directs the President to report to Congress concerning the effects of Federal agency activity upon: (1) the transportation and agriculture industries by January 31, 1978; (2) the mining, heavy manufacturing, and public utilities industries by January 31, 1979; (3) the light manufacturing and construction industries by January 31, 1980; and (4) the communications, finance, insurance, real estate, trade, and service industries by January 31, 1981. Requires that such report include a determination of whether any such agency activity has fulfilled its purposes, whether it is duplicative or conflicts with other agency activity, and whether the benefits of such activity exceed its costs. Directs the President to present in such report his recommendation for reform.

States that the Congressional committee to which a proposal made by the President is referred must report to its respective House a bill approving or disapproving, in whole or in part, such proposal. Provides that if such a bill has not been reported by November 15 next following the submission of such report, the President's proposal shall become the pending order of business in both Houses and remain so until acted upon.