As of 07/31/2021 text has not been received for H.R.14957 - A bill to amend title 23 of the District of Columbia Code with respect to the release or detention prior to trial of persons charged with certain violent or dangerous criminal offenses.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 23 of the District of Columbia Code with respect to the release or detention prior to trial of persons charged with certain violent or dangerous criminal offenses.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/23/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
08/10/1976Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 94-1419.
07/29/1976Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/24/1976SenateReferred to Senate Committee on the District of Columbia.
08/23/1976HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
08/23/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
08/23/1976HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
08/10/1976HouseReported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 94-1419.
07/29/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
07/29/1976HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]
Rep. Rees, Thomas M. [D-CA-26]
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-37]
Del. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]
Rep. Railsback, Thomas F. [R-IL-19]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House District of Columbia07/29/1976 Referred to
08/10/1976 Reported by H.Rept 94-1419
Senate District of Columbia08/24/1976 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.14957.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.14957. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/29/1976)

Amends the District of Columbia Code to apply provisions relating to pretrial detention of persons charged with capital crimes only to those defendants charged with first degree murder or forcible rape.

Limits the application of provisions relating to pretrial detention of defendants presently on probation, parole, or mandatory release pending completion of sentence to those persons charged with (1) a dangerous crime, (2) a violent crime, or (3) an obstruction or attempted obstruction of justice by threatening or injuring a prospective witness or juror. Extends the maximum permissable detention period of such a defendant pending notification to appropriate state or Federal courts or officials to ten days. Empowers a judicial officer to order that such a defendant be detained until trial upon finding a substantial probability that the defendant committed the offense as charged. Grants specified procedural rights to persons so detained.

Permits institution of pretrial detention hearings by a judicial officer on such officer's own initiative.

Extends to 90 days the period after which a defendant who is charged with a dangerous crime, a violent crime, or an obstruction of justice and is ordered detained pending trial must be released, unless the trial is in progress or has been delayed at the request of the defendant.