Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to increase the temporary debt limitation and to extend such temporary limitation until June 30, 1975.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
02/19/1975Public law 94-3.
02/19/1975Signed by President.
02/19/1975Measure presented to President.
02/18/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, roll call #10 (70-20).
02/17/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance, S. Rept. 94-12.
02/05/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, roll call #14 (248-170).
02/04/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
02/19/1975Public law 94-3.
02/19/1975Signed by President.
02/19/1975HouseMeasure presented to President.
02/19/1975Measure enrolled in Senate.
02/19/1975Measure enrolled in House.
02/18/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate, roll call #10 (70-20).
02/18/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
02/18/1975SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
02/17/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Finance, S. Rept. 94-12.
02/06/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Finance.
02/05/1975HouseMeasure passed House, roll call #14 (248-170).
02/05/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
02/05/1975HouseMeasure called up by special rule in House.
02/04/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
02/04/1975HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/04/1975 Referred to
Senate Finance02/06/1975 Referred to
02/17/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-12

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2634. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/1975)

Increases temporarily the public debt limitation set forth in the Second Liberty Bond Act by $131,000,000,000 until June 30, 1975.