Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend section 109 of title 23, United States Code, relating to the preparation of certain statements on highway projects in the States of New York, Vermont, and Connecticut.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/21/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #130 (275-99).
04/11/1975Reported adversely to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries, H. Rept. 94-111 (Part II).
03/22/1975Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation with amendment, H. Rept. 94-111 (Part I).
02/26/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/22/1975SenateReferred jointly to Senate Committees on Interior and Insular Affairs; and Public Works.
04/21/1975HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #130 (275-99).
04/21/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
04/21/1975HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
04/11/1975HouseReported adversely to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries, H. Rept. 94-111 (Part II).
03/22/1975HouseReported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation with amendment, H. Rept. 94-111 (Part I).
02/26/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
02/26/1975HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation02/26/1975 Referred to
03/22/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-111 Part 1
Senate Interior and Insular Affairs04/22/1975 Referred to
Senate Public Works04/22/1975 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries04/11/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-111 Part 2

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3787. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (03/22/1975)

(Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation with amendment, H. Rept. 94-111 (Part I))

States that any detailed statement required by the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 for any Federal-aid highway project in the States of New York, Vermont, and Connecticut which was prepared by the State on or after January 1, 1970, and which after analysis and evaluation has been adopted or is hereafter adopted by the Secretary of Transportation shall be deemed a statement prepared by the Secretary of Transportation for the purposes of the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969.