Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Coastal Zone Environment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Coastal Zone Management Act of 1972 to authorize and assist the coastal States to study, plan for, manage, and control the impact of energy resource development and production which affects the coastal zone.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/11/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #100 (370-14).
03/04/1976Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 94-878.
02/27/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/11/1976Measure laid on table in House, S. 586 passed in lieu.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/1976Measure passed House, amended, roll call #100 (370-14).
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/1976Measure considered in House.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/1976Measure called up by special rule in House.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/1976Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 94-878.
02/27/1975Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1975Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries02/27/1975 Referred to
03/04/1976 Reported by H.Rept 94-878

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3981. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/11/1976)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #100 (370-14))

Coastal Zone Management Act Amendments - Redefines "coastal zone" under the Coastal Zone Management Act of 1972, and defines, under such Act, "outer continental shelf energy activity," "energy facilities," and "coastal energy activity.

Requires State management programs to include a planning process for energy facilities likely to be located in the coastal zone. Increases the maximum Federal share of development grants, under such Act, from 66 2/3 percent to 80 percent. Authorizes annual grants to coastal States of up to 80 percent of the cost of implementing State management programs, if such programs are preliminarily approved. Makes States eligible for such implementation grants through September 30, 1976. Extends authorization of management program development grants through September 30, 1976.

Requires a coastal State to establish an effective coordination and consultative mechanism between a designated State coastal zone agency and local governments within such State. Requires States to consider any applicable interstate energy plans or programs in the planning for and siting of energy facilities in the coastal zone of such States.

Directs the Secretary of Commerce, in cooperation with the Executive Office of the President, to mediate the difference between a Federal agency and a State in the implementation of an approved State management program, in cases of serious disagreement. Requires such differences to be resolved through public hearings in the area concerned.

Requires annual payments to coastal States in amounts relative to: (1) the Outer Continental Shelf leases adjacent to such States; (2) the number of development wells adjacent to such States; (3) the volume of oil and natural gas produced adjacent to such States; and (4) additional indicia relating to the Outer Continental Shelf. Requires the States to expend such payments, in part, for the retirement of State and local bonds which were issued for projects or programs designed to provide revenues which are to be used to provide public services and facilities which are made necessary by Outer Continental Shelf energy activity. Authorizes appropriations through fiscal year 1981 for such payments.

States the intent of the Congress that the States should allocate all or a portion of such payments to local governments.

Authorizes grants of up to 80 percent to coastal States whose coastal zone is being or is likely to be impacted by energy facilities, to enable such States to study and plan for such consequences. Requires that funds for such grants be deposited in the Coastal Energy Activity Impact Fund. Authorizes appropriations through fiscal year 1981 for such Fund. States the intent of the Congress that the States should allocate all or a portion of such grant funds to local governments.

Authorizes grants of up to 90 percent for the coordination of State coastal zone planning, policies, and programs in contiguous interstate areas, and for studying, planning, and implementing unified coastal zone policies in such areas.

Authorizes the Secretary to conduct a program of research and training to support the development and implementation of State coastal zone management programs, and a comprehensive review of all aspects of the shellfish industry, on which a report to the Congress shall be made. Authorizes grants to coastal States for acquisition of access to public beaches and other public coastal areas.

Authorizes appropriations through fiscal year 1980 to carry out the various provisions of this Act.

Allows the Secretary to guarantee, through September 30, 1981, the payment of interest on and the principal balance of bonds issued by coastal States or local governments therein for the purpose of obtaining revenues to be used to provide public services and public facilities made necessary by Outer Continental Shelf energy activities. Permits guarantee for any one State or local government of amounts up to $20,000,000.

Directs the Secretary to establish a revolving fund to provide for the payment of any liability incurred through such guarantees, and authorizes appropriations to such fund.