Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to designate the Veterans' Administration hospital in Loma Linda, Calif., as the "Jerry L. Pettis Memorial Veterans' Hospital", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
03/25/1976Public law 94-246.
03/25/1976Signed by President.
03/17/1976Measure presented to President.
03/15/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
03/11/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, S. Rept. 94-693.
10/06/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
09/18/1975Reported to House from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, H. Rept. 94-486.
02/27/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
03/25/1976Public law 94-246.
03/25/1976Signed by President.
03/17/1976HouseMeasure presented to President.
03/16/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
03/16/1976Measure enrolled in House.
03/15/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate.
03/15/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
03/15/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
03/11/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, S. Rept. 94-693.
10/07/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
10/06/1975HouseMeasure passed House.
10/06/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
10/06/1975HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
09/18/1975HouseReported to House from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, H. Rept. 94-486.
02/27/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/27/1975HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Bell, Alphonzo [R-CA-28]
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-27]
Rep. Hinshaw, Andrew J. [R-CA-39]
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-13]
Rep. Rousselot, John H. [R-CA-24]
Rep. Talcott, Burt L. [R-CA-12]
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-20]
Rep. Wiggins, Charles E. [R-CA-25]
Rep. Burgener, Clair W. [R-CA-42]
Rep. Ketchum, William M. [R-CA-36]
Rep. Clawson, Del [R-CA-23]
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-1]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/27/1975 Referred to
09/18/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-486
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/07/1975 Referred to
03/11/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-693

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4034. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/1975)

Designates the Veterans' Administration hospital in Loma Linda, California, as the "Jerry L. Pettis Memorial Veterans' Hospital.

Authorizes the Administrator of Veterans' Affairs to provide a memorial at such hospital in memory of the late Jerry L. Pettis.