Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide for more effective congressional review of administrative actions which exempt petroleum products from the Emergency Petroleum Allocation Act of 1973, or which result in a major increase in the price of domestic crude oil; and to provide for an interim extension of certain expiring energy authorities.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
07/21/1975Vetoed by President, H. Doc. 94-218.
07/18/1975Measure presented to President.
07/17/1975Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report, roll call #404 (239-172).
07/16/1975Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #287 (57-40).
07/14/1975Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 94-282.
07/14/1975Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-356.
06/11/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended (Provisions of S. 621 as passed inserted).
06/05/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #267 (230-151).
03/14/1975Reported to House from the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with amendment, H. Rept. 94-65.
02/27/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/21/1975Vetoed by President, H. Doc. 94-218.
07/18/1975HouseMeasure presented to President.
07/18/1975Measure enrolled in Senate.
07/18/1975Measure enrolled in House.
07/17/1975HouseHouse agreed to conference report, roll call #404 (239-172).
07/16/1975SenateSenate agreed to conference report, roll call #287 (57-40).
07/14/1975SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 94-282.
07/14/1975HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-356.
06/12/1975HouseConference scheduled in House.
06/11/1975SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
06/11/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended (Provisions of S. 621 as passed inserted).
06/11/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/11/1975SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
06/06/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
06/05/1975HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #267 (230-151).
06/05/1975HouseMotion to recommit to the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with instructions rejected in House.
06/05/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
06/05/1975HouseMeasure called up by special rule in House.
03/14/1975HouseReported to House from the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with amendment, H. Rept. 94-65.
02/27/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
02/27/1975HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17]
Rep. Eckhardt, Bob [D-TX-8]
Rep. Moffett, Toby [D-CT-6]
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]
Rep. Heinz, John [R-PA-18]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interstate and Foreign Commerce02/27/1975 Referred to
03/14/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-65
Senate Interior and Insular Affairs06/06/1975 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4035. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (07/14/1975)

(House agreed to conference report, roll call #404 (239-172))

Petroleum Pricing Review Act - Authorizes the President to prescribe an amendment to the regulation under the Emergency Petroleum Allocation Act of 1973 exempting crude oil, residual fuel oil, or any refined petroleum product from the provisions of such regulation pertaining to allocation or pricing of such products.

Prescribes procedures whereby either House of the Congress may disapprove such an amendment.

Requires the President, with such a proposed amendment, to submit his findings regarding the need for it; the effect on prices of petroleum products; the effect on domestic production and consumption of petroleum products; and the impact upon living costs, employment, and real income.

Exempts from the procedural requirements of this Act changes in the pricing and allocation regulation if: (1) the purpose of such amendment is to take into account decline in field production or significant increases in the cost of production of crude oil resulting from the use of secondary or tertiary recovery methods; and (2) such amendment would not permit increases in the price of old crude oil or any classification thereof so as to result in a national average price of old crude oil which exceeds by more than 50 cents per barrel the January 1, 1975, base price.

States that no such amendment which takes effect after January 1, 1975, and prior to the date of enactment of this Act, may remain in effect for a period of longer than 30 days after such date of enactment, and the President shall rescind any such amendment within such 30-day period, unless such amendment is transmitted to the Congress within such 30-day period for review under the provisions of this Act.

States that not later than 30 days after the date of enactment of this Act, the President shall promulgate and put into effect an amendment which shall specify a price or prices for all crude oil produced in the United States which is not old crude oil.

States that such price or prices shall not be, or result in, a price or prices for such oil which are greater than the price or prices generally prevailing on January 31, 1975, for crude oil subject to such amendment.

States that insofar as any regulation shall require the purchase of entitlements, or the payment of money through any other similar cash transfer arrangement aimed at equalizing the cost of crude oil to domestic refiners, such regulation shall exempt from such requirement the first 50,000 barrels per day of any refiner whose total refining capacity did not exceed on January 1, 1975, 100,000 barrels per day.

Extends through December 31, 1975, the allocation and price control authorities of the Emergency Petroleum Allocation Act and the coal conservation and energy data gathering authorities contained in the Energy Supply and Environmental Coordination Act.