Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to reserve a site for the use of the Smithsonian Institution.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
08/08/1975Public law 94-74.
08/08/1975Signed by President.
07/29/1975Measure presented to President.
07/25/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
07/23/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-301.
06/16/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
06/04/1975Reported to House from the Committee on House Administration with amendment, H. Rept. 94-257.
03/21/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
08/08/1975Public law 94-74.
08/08/1975Signed by President.
07/29/1975HouseMeasure presented to President.
07/28/1975Measure enrolled in Senate.
07/28/1975Measure enrolled in House.
07/25/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate.
07/25/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
07/25/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
07/23/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-301.
06/17/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.
06/16/1975HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
06/16/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
06/16/1975HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
06/04/1975HouseReported to House from the Committee on House Administration with amendment, H. Rept. 94-257.
03/21/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on House Administration.
03/21/1975HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration03/21/1975 Referred to
06/04/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-257
Senate Rules and Administration06/17/1975 Referred to
07/23/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-301

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5327. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (06/04/1975)

(Reported to House from the Committee on House Administration with amendment, H. Rept. 94-257)

Reserves that portion of the Mall bounded by Third Street, Maryland Avenue, Fourth Street, and Jefferson Drive in the District of Columbia as a site for the future public uses of the Smithsonian Institution.

Prohibits the Institution from making use of such site without the approval of the Congress.