Summary: H.R.6334 — 94th Congress (1975-1976)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 94-130 (11/14/1975)

(Public law 94-130)

Authorizes appropriations under the Peace Corps Act of $88,468,000 for fiscal year 1976 and $27,887,000 from July 1, 1976 through September 30, 1976 to carry out the provisions of such Act.

Authorizes additional appropriations not to exceed $1,000,000 for fiscal year 1976 for increases in salary, pay, retirement and other employee benefits.

Requires the Director of ACTION to transfer up to $315,000 to the ACTION readjustment allowance account at the Treasury Department to rectify the imbalance in the Peace Corps readjustment allowance account from March 1, 1961 to February 28, 1973.

Increases the monthly stipend for VISTA volunteers from $50 to $75. Authorizes appropriations as necessary for such purpose.

Prohibits discrimination on the basis of sex in enrolling Peace Corps volunteers.

Increases the monthly readjustment allowance for Peace Corps volunteers from $75 to $125.