Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Consumer Product Safety Commission Improvements Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Consumer Product Safety Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/22/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #636 (313-86).
06/24/1975Reported to House from the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with amendment, H. Rept. 94-325.
05/08/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
10/22/1975Measure laid on table in House, S. 644 passed in lieu.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/1975Measure passed House, amended, roll call #636 (313-86).
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/1975Motion to recommit to the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with instructions passed House, roll call #635 (204-198).
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/1975Measure considered in House.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/1975Measure considered in House.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/1975Measure considered in House.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/1975Measure considered in House.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/1975Measure considered in House.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/1975Measure called up by special rule in House.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/1975Reported to House from the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with amendment, H. Rept. 94-325.
05/08/1975Referred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/1975Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Metcalfe, Ralph H. [D-IL-1]
Rep. McCollister, John Y. [R-NE-2]

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interstate and Foreign Commerce05/08/1975 Referred to
06/24/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-325

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6844. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/22/1975)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #636 (313-86))

Consumer Product Safety Commission Improvements Act - Authorizes appropriations for the purposes of carrying out the provisions of the Consumer Product Safety Act (other than the provisions relating to the planning and construction of facilities) and for the purpose of carrying out the specified functions, powers, and duties transferred to the Consumer Product Safety Commission.

Authorizes $51,000,000 for fiscal year 1976; $14,000,000 for the transition period ending September 30, 1976; $60,000,000 for fiscal year 1977; and $68,000,000 for fiscal year 1978.

Removes from the Consumer Product Safety Commission jurisdiction over pesticides under the Poison Prevention Packaging Act of 1970.

Removes the Commission's jurisdiction to ban cigarettes under the Federal Hazardous Substances Act, or to exercise any regulatory authority over tobacco and tobacco products.

Removes the Commission's jurisdiction to exercise any regulatory authority over handguns or ammunition.

Authorizes the Chairman to establish 10 career positions in grades GS-16, GS-17, and GS-18.

Extends the period provided under the Consumer Product Safety Act for the development of consumer product safety standards.

Makes it unlawful for any person to fail to comply with rules requiring the establishment and maintenance of records.

Authorizes the Commission to prohibit the manufacture for sale, offering for sale, distribution in commerce, or importation into the United States of products which have been determined to present a substantial product hazard.

Provides that no consumer product safety standard shall require, incorporate, or reference any sampling plan, except any consumer product safety standard or other agency action of the Commission under this Act: (1) applicable to a fabric, related material, or product which is subject to a flammability standard or for which a flammability standard or other regulation may be promulgated under the Flammability Fabrics Act or (2) which is or may be applicable to glass bottles.

Provides that if a Federal requirement for a product is in effect under one of the laws administered by the Commission, no State or political subdivision of a State may establish or continue in effect a requirement applicable to the same product and designed to protect against the same risk of injury or illness unless the State or local subdivision requirement is identical to the Federal requirement, except as otherwise provided pursuant to this Act.

Provides that members of the Flammable Fabrics Advisory Committee who are appointed to represent manufacturers shall include representatives from the natural fiber producing industry, the man-made fiber producing industry, and manufacturers of fabrics, related materials, apparel, or interior furnishings.

Affords the Congress opportunity to disapprove each consumer safety standard promulgated and each rule, regulation, and order promulgated by the Commission pursuant to a specific authorization or requirement prescribed by this Consumer Product Safety Act, the Federal Hazardous Substances Act, the Poison Prevention Packaging Act of 1970, or the Flammable Fabrics Act.