Summary: H.R.7706 — 94th Congress (1975-1976)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (10/07/1975)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-533)

Suspends, under the Tariff Schedules of the United States, the duty on natural graphite until June 30, 1978.

Permits payments under the Social Security Act with respect to expenditures made prior to February 1, 1976, in connection with the provision of child day care services in day care centers and group day care homes, in the case of children between the ages of six weeks and six years, to be made without regard to the requirements relating to staffing standards which are imposed by such Act, so long as the staffing standards actually being applied in the provision of the services involved comply with applicable State law and are no lower, in the case of any day care center or group day care home, than the corresponding standards actually being applied in such center or home on September 15, 1975.

Provides, under the Social Security Act, with regard to ending the dependency of individuals who are alcoholics or drug addicts, the entire rehabilitative process for such individuals, including but not limited to initial detoxification, short term residential treatment, and subsequent outpatient counseling and rehabilitative services, shall be the basis for determining whether specified standards, relating to the provision of medical or remedial care or of room or board, imposed under this Act have been met.

States that no payment may be made under this Act with respect to any expenditure for the provision of any service to any individual living in any hospital, skilled nursing facility, or intermediate care facility, any prison, or any foster family home, except any expenditure for the initial detoxification of an alcoholic or drug dependent individual, for a period not to exceed seven days, if such detoxification is integral to the further provision of services for which such individual would otherwise be eligible.

Makes such amendments relating to alcoholics and drug dependents effective only from October 1, 1975, through January 31, 1976.