Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to suspend until the close of October 31, 1975, the duty on catalysts of platinum and carbon used in producing caprolactam.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
08/08/1975Public law 94-75.
08/08/1975Signed by President.
07/29/1975Measure presented to President.
07/25/1975Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendments.
07/16/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
07/09/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance with amendment, S. Rept. 94-274.
06/24/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
06/16/1975Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means, H. Rept. 94-302.
06/09/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/08/1975Public law 94-75.
08/08/1975Signed by President.
07/29/1975HouseMeasure presented to President.
07/29/1975Measure enrolled in Senate.
07/29/1975Measure enrolled in House.
07/25/1975HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendments.
07/16/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
07/16/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
07/16/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
07/09/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Finance with amendment, S. Rept. 94-274.
06/25/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Finance.
06/24/1975HouseMeasure passed House.
06/24/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
06/24/1975HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
06/16/1975HouseReported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means, H. Rept. 94-302.
06/09/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/09/1975HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Landrum, Phil M. [D-GA-9]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/09/1975 Referred to
06/16/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-302
Senate Finance06/25/1975 Referred to
07/09/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-274

No related bill information was received for H.R.7728.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7728. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/09/1975)

Suspends until October 31, 1975, the import duty under the U.S. Tariff Schedules on catalysts of platinum and carbon used in producing caprolactam.