Summary: H.Con.Res.324 — 94th Congress (1975-1976)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment (06/26/1975)

(House agreed to Senate amendment)

Provides for a House adjournment from June 26, 1975 until July 8, 1975, and a Senate adjournment from June 27, 1975 until July 7, 1975.