Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Concurrent resolution providing for the printing of a revised edition of the House document, "Our American Government, What is it? How Does It Function?"


Actions Overview (5)

Date
05/14/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
05/13/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-127.
03/06/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
03/06/1975Reported to House from the Committee on House Administration with amendment, H. Rept. 94-39.
01/15/1975Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
05/14/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate.
05/14/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/14/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/13/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-127.
03/10/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.
03/06/1975HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
03/06/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
03/06/1975HouseMeasure called up as privileged matter in House.
03/06/1975HouseReported to House from the Committee on House Administration with amendment, H. Rept. 94-39.
01/15/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on House Administration.
01/15/1975HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration01/15/1975 Referred to
03/06/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-39
Senate Rules and Administration03/10/1975 Referred to
05/13/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-127

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.44.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.44. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/06/1975)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Provides that there shall be printed, as a House document, a revised edition of the House document "Our American Government. What Is It? How Does It Function?"

Provides that 566,000 additional copies be printed, of which 442,000 shall be for the use of the House of Representatives and 103,000 shall be for the use of the Senate, and 1,000 shall be for the use of the House Committee on Rules and 20,000 shall be for the use of the Joint Committee on Printing.