Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the National Portrait Gallery Act to redefine "portraiture."


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
02/05/1976Public law 94-209.
02/05/1976Signed by President.
01/26/1976Measure presented to President.
01/19/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House in lieu of H.R. 6397.
07/25/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
07/23/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-299.
05/06/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/05/1976Public law 94-209.
02/05/1976Signed by President.
01/26/1976SenateMeasure presented to President.
01/26/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
01/26/1976Measure enrolled in House.
01/19/1976HouseMeasure passed House in lieu of H.R. 6397.
01/19/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
01/19/1976HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
07/28/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on House Administration.
07/25/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate.
07/25/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
07/25/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
07/23/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-299.
05/06/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Moss, Frank E. [D-UT]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration05/06/1975 Referred to
07/23/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-299
House Administration07/28/1975 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1657. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/06/1975)

States that for purposes of the National Portrait Gallery Act the term "portraiture" includes portraits and reproductions thereof made by any means or process, whether invented or developed heretofore or hereafter.