Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Food Stamp Act of 1964.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/10/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
05/15/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry with amendment, S. Rept. 94-139.
05/06/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
06/11/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on Agriculture.
06/10/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
06/10/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/10/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/15/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry with amendment, S. Rept. 94-139.
05/06/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Agriculture and Forestry.

Cosponsors (13)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Bellmon, Henry L. [R-OK]
Sen. Clark, Dick [D-IA]
Sen. Curtis, Carl T. [R-NE]
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]
Sen. Eastland, James O. [D-MS]
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]
Sen. Humphrey, Hubert H. [D-MN]
Sen. McGovern, George [D-SD]
Sen. Talmadge, Herman E. [D-GA]
Sen. Young, Milton R. [R-ND]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture and Forestry05/06/1975 Referred to
05/15/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-139
House Agriculture06/11/1975 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1662.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1662. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (06/10/1975)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Revises the Agriculture and Consumer Protection Act of 1973 which amended the Food Stamp Act of 1964, to provide that for the 12-month period ending June 30, 1976, no individual receiving supplemental security income benefits under title XVI of the Social Security Act shall be considered a member of a household or an elderly person or that no such individual shall be considered a member of a household for purposes of the Food Stamp Act or the family commodity distribution program for any month during such period in which such an individual resides in a State which provides State supplementary payments which have been specifically increased so as to include the bonus value of food stamps.

Provides that, for purposes of the food stamp program and the family commodity distribution program, the level of supplementary security income payments under the Social Security Act shall be found by the Secretary of Health, Education, and Welfare to have been specifically increased so as to include the bonus value of food stamps only if, prior to October 1, 1973, the State has entered into an agreement with the Secretary or taken other positive steps which demonstrate its intention to provide supplementary payments at a specified level.

Allows household members of persons who are elderly, housebound, feeble, physically handicapped, or otherwise disabled, to the extent that they are unable to adequately prepare all of their meals, to use coupons issued to them to purchase meals prepared for and delivered to them by a political subdivision or by a private nonprofit organization which meets specified qualifications.

Directs the Secretary to provide certification procedures for applicant households not later than thirty days after enactment of this Act which shall provide for the following: (1) each potential applicant to have an opportunity to file an application for participation in the food stamp program on the same day of such person's first reasonable attempt to make a request for food stamp aid; and (2) immediate thirty-day certification, and issuance of an authorization to purchase card, to any household which meets the uniform national standards of eligibility on the face of the application.