Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations to the Nuclear Regulatory Commission in accordance with section 261 of the Atomic Energy Act of 1954, as amended, and section 305 of the Energy Reorganization Act of 1974, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
08/09/1975Public law 94-79.
08/09/1975Signed by President.
08/02/1975Measure presented to President.
07/31/1975Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments.
06/20/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 7001.
06/17/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
06/04/1975Reported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy, S. Rept. 94-174.
05/12/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/09/1975Public law 94-79.
08/09/1975Signed by President.
08/02/1975SenateMeasure presented to President.
08/01/1975Measure enrolled in Senate.
08/01/1975Measure enrolled in House.
07/31/1975SenateSenate agreed to House amendments.
06/20/1975HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 7001.
06/20/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
06/20/1975HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
06/17/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
06/17/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/17/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
06/04/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy, S. Rept. 94-174.
05/12/1975SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Atomic Energy.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Baker, Howard H., Jr. [R-TN]

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Joint Atomic Energy05/12/1975 Referred to
06/04/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-174

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1716. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/20/1975)

(Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 7001)

=Title I:= Authorizes appropriations for the Nuclear Regulatory Commission through September 1976.

=Title II:= Provides, under the Energy Reorganization Act of 1974, that the chairman of the Commission shall be the principal executive officer of the Commission, and he shall exercise all of the executive and administrative functions of the Commission.

Requires that the chairman shall be goverened by general policies of the Commission and by such regulatory decisions, findings, and determinations as the Commission may by law be authorized to make.

Reserves to the Commission its functions with respect to revising budget estimates and with respect to determining the distribution of appropriated funds according to major programs and purposes.

Prohibits the Commission from licensing any shipments by air transport of plutonium in any form, whether exports, imports or domestic shipments, except medical devices designed for individual human application. Provides that this restriction shall be in force until the Nuclear Regulatory Commission has certified to the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy of the Congress that a safe container has been developed and tested.

States that for the purpose of determining the expiration date of the terms of office of the five Commission members first appointed be deemed to have begun July 1, 1975.