Summary: S.1849 — 94th Congress (1975-1976)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/15/1975)

(Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #281 (62-29))

=Title I:= Emergency Petroleum Allocation Extension Act - Extends the provisions of the Emergency Petroleum Allocation Act from August 31, 1975, through March 1, 1976.

=Title II:= Coal Conversion Extension Act - Extends from June 30, 1975, through December 31, 1975, the authority of the Federal Energy Administration (FEA) Administrator to issue coal conversion orders. Requires the FEA to include information on coal pricing trends in its quarterly information reports.