Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Animal Welfare Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to amend the Act of August 24, 1966, as amended, to increase the protection afforded animals in transit and to assure humane treatment of certain animals, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the protection afforded animals in transit and to assure the humane treatment of animals.


Actions Overview (11)

Date Actions Overview
04/22/1976Public law 94-279.
04/22/1976Signed by President.
04/14/1976Measure presented to President.
04/07/1976Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #131 (91-0).
04/06/1976Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report, roll call #174 (332-31).
03/30/1976Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 94-727.
03/29/1976Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-976.
02/09/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 5808.
12/18/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
12/18/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 94-580.
06/13/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/22/1976Public law 94-279.
04/22/1976Signed by President.
04/14/1976SenateMeasure presented to President.
04/09/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
04/09/1976Measure enrolled in House.
04/07/1976SenateSenate agreed to conference report, roll call #131 (91-0).
04/06/1976HouseHouse agreed to conference report, roll call #174 (332-31).
03/30/1976SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 94-727.
03/29/1976HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-976.
03/09/1976HouseConference scheduled in House.
03/04/1976SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
02/09/1976HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 5808.
02/09/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
02/09/1976HouseMeasure called up by special rule in House.
12/19/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on Agriculture.
12/18/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
12/18/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
12/18/1975SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
12/18/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 94-580.
06/13/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Commerce.

Cosponsors (3)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Magnuson, Warren G. [D-WA]
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD]
Sen. Griffin, Robert P. [R-MI]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce06/13/1975 Referred to
12/18/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-580
House Agriculture12/19/1975 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1941. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (03/29/1976)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-976)

Animal Welfare Act Amendments - Defines terms to be used in the Animal Welfare Act, including: "dealer," which shall not include retail pet stores; and "intermediate handler," which shall mean any person including a department of the United States Government or of any State or local government who is engaged in any business in which he receives custody of animals in connection with their transportation in interstate commerce.

Provides that at the request of the Secretary of Agriculture any regulatory agency which requires records to be maintained by intermediate handlers and carriers with respect to the transportation in commerce of animals shall require inclusion in such records of such information as the Secretary may require for the administration of this Act.

Directs the Secretary to promulgate standards governing the transportation and care by intermediate handlers, and carriers of animals consigned by any dealer, research facility, exhibitor, operator of an auction sale, or a department or agency of the Federal, State, or local governments. Prohibits delivery for transportation or transportation by such persons and entities of dogs, cats, and other animals as may be specified, unless accompanied by a certificate from a veterinarian certifying that the animal is, ten days before delivery, free of infectious disease or physical abnormality which would endanger the animal or the public health. Prohibits transportation of such animals, except to research facilities, unless such animals are above a specified age.

Disallows shipment of animals C.O.D., unless specified charges are guaranteed by the consignor.

Permits the Secretary of Transportation to disapprove, before promulgation, standards for the air transport of animals.

Directs the Secretary to promulgate rules and regulations to permit inspectors to confiscate or destroy in a humane manner any animal found to be suffering as a result of a failure to comply with the Animal Welfare Act. Permits the Secretary to make investigations to determine violations, and imposes a $5,000 fine and/or a one-year imprisonment for specified violations of such Act.

Defines "animal fighting venture" for purposes of such Act.

Authorizes the Secretary to suspend licenses of dealers, exhibitors, or operators of auction sales for violations of this Act. Subjects any dealer, exhibitor, research facility, intermediate handler, carrier, or operator of an auction sale to a civil penalty of $1,000 per violation and to cease and desist orders for violations of such Act or rules or regulations thereunder. Withholds implementation of any such penalty or order pending a hearing. Provides for judicial review of orders of the Secretary under such Act. Subjects dealers, exhibitors, or operators of auction sales to criminal penalties of $1,000 and/or a one-year imprisonment for knowing violations of such Act.

Requires promulgation of regulations relating to intermediate handlers and carriers required under this Act within nine months of enactment, and for compliance with this Act and such regulations within 90 days thereafter.

Makes it unlawful for any person to knowingly sponsor or exhibit an animal in any animal fighting venture to which any animal was moved in interstate commerce; and for any person to knowingly sell, buy, or transport in commerce any dog or other animal for an animal fighting venture. Authorizes appropriations for the enforcement of such provisions relating to animal fighting ventures.