Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations for the repair of highways in the State of Alaska.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/26/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
12/19/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Public Works with amendment, S. Rept. 94-587.
07/09/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
01/27/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
01/26/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
01/26/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
01/26/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
12/19/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Public Works with amendment, S. Rept. 94-587.
07/09/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Public Works.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Public Works07/09/1975 Referred to
12/19/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-587
House Public Works and Transportation01/27/1976 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2071.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2071. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (01/26/1976)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Authorizes the appropriation of $70,000,000 for repair of highways in the State of Alaska. Requires the Secretary of Transportation to report to the Congress by January 7, 1977, as to the feasibility of repayment of any such funds by the State of Alaska, out of mineral revenues to be received by it in the future.