Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to authorize the establishment of the Eugene O'Neill National Historic Site, to provide for a cooperative agreement in the operation of the Cherokee Strip Living Museum and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the establishment of the Eugene O'Neill National Historic Site.


Actions Overview (11)

Date
10/18/1976Public law 94-539.
10/18/1976Signed by President.
10/07/1976Measure presented to President.
10/01/1976Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments with amendment.
10/01/1976Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment.
10/01/1976Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment.
09/27/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 9126.
09/27/1976Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged in House.
05/13/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
05/11/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-809.
09/24/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
10/18/1976Public law 94-539.
10/18/1976Signed by President.
10/07/1976SenateMeasure presented to President.
10/07/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
10/06/1976Measure enrolled in House.
10/01/1976SenateSenate agreed to House amendments with amendment.
10/01/1976SenateSenate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment.
10/01/1976HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendment with amendment.
09/27/1976HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 9126.
09/27/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/27/1976HouseCommittee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged in House.
05/17/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
05/13/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
05/13/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/13/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/11/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-809.
09/24/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Tunney, John V. [D-CA]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Interior and Insular Affairs09/24/1975 Referred to
05/11/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-809
House Interior and Insular Affairs05/17/1976 Referred to
09/27/1976 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2398. View summaries

Shown Here:
House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment (10/01/1976)

(House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment)

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to accept the donation of, or purchase with funds donated for the acquisition of, the property formerly owned by Eugene O'Neill. Designates the property as the Eugene O'Neill National Historic Site.

=Title II:= Authorizes the Secretary to accept the donation of the Cherokee Strip Living Museum in Arkansas City, Kansas, and to administer such museum.