There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations to the Nuclear Regulatory Commission in accordance with section 261 of the Atomic Energy Act of 1954, as amended, and section 305 of the Energy Reorganization Act of 1974, as amended, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/1976Public law 94-291.
05/22/1976Signed by President.
05/12/1976Measure presented to President.
05/10/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, in lieu of H.R. 12387.
05/05/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
05/03/1976Reported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy with amendment, S. Rept. 94-772.
03/09/1976Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/22/1976Public law 94-291.
05/22/1976Signed by President.
05/12/1976SenateMeasure presented to President.
05/12/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
05/11/1976Measure enrolled in House.
05/10/1976HouseMeasure passed House, in lieu of H.R. 12387.
05/10/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
05/10/1976HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
05/05/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
05/05/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/05/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/03/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy with amendment, S. Rept. 94-772.
03/09/1976SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Atomic Energy.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Javits, Jacob K. [R-NY]

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Joint Atomic Energy03/09/1976 Referred to
05/03/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-772

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3107. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (05/03/1976)

(Reported to Senate from the Joint Committee on Atomic Energy with amendment, S. Rept. 94-772)

Authorizes the appropriation of $274,300,000 to the Nuclear Resulatory Commission for salaries and expenses.

Stipulates that such sums shall remain available until expended. Authorizes the transfer of funds between agencies of the Government for performance of related functions.

Provides, under the Commission Authorization Act of 1976, Public Law 94-79, that moneys received by the Commission for the cooperative nuclear research program may be retained and used for salaries and expenses associated with that program.