Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill relating to the display of certain historical documents within the U.S. Capitol Building during the calendar year 1976.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
06/30/1976Public law 94-327.
06/30/1976Signed by President.
06/21/1976Measure presented to President.
06/18/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
06/18/1976Committee on House Administration discharged in House.
06/10/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
06/03/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-924.
05/20/1976Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/30/1976Public law 94-327.
06/30/1976Signed by President.
06/21/1976SenateMeasure presented to President.
06/21/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
06/21/1976Measure enrolled in House.
06/18/1976HouseMeasure passed House.
06/18/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
06/18/1976HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged in House.
06/11/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on House Administration.
06/10/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate.
06/10/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/10/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
06/03/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-924.
05/20/1976SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration05/20/1976 Referred to
06/03/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-924
House Administration06/11/1976 Referred to
06/18/1976 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.3475.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3475. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/20/1976)

Stipulates that no provision of law shall be construed to prohibit the exhibition of the drawings entered in the 1793 architectural competition for the design of the United States Capitol Building in such building during the Bicentennial year.