Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

National Influenza Program

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize the establishment and implementation of an emergency national swine flu immunization program and to provide an exclusive remedy for personal injury or death arising out of the manufacture, distribution, or administration of the swine flue vaccine under such program.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize the establishment and implementation of a national influenza immunization program and to provide an exclusive remedy for persons injured as a result of inoculation with vaccine under such program.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
08/12/1976Public law 94-380.
08/12/1976Signed by President.
08/12/1976Measure presented to President.
08/10/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, roll call #638 (250-83).
08/10/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
08/10/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations, S. Rept. 94-1147.
08/06/1976Committee on Labor and Public Welfare discharged in Senate.
08/05/1976Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
08/12/1976Public law 94-380.
08/12/1976Signed by President.
08/12/1976SenateMeasure presented to President.
08/11/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
08/11/1976Measure enrolled in House.
08/10/1976HouseMeasure passed House, roll call #638 (250-83).
08/10/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
08/10/1976HouseMeasure called up by special rule in House.
08/10/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
08/10/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
08/10/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
08/10/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations, S. Rept. 94-1147.
08/10/1976SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
08/06/1976SenatePlaced on calendar in Senate.
08/06/1976SenateCommittee on Labor and Public Welfare discharged in Senate.
08/05/1976SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Labor and Public Welfare.

Cosponsors (6)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Javits, Jacob K. [R-NY]
Sen. Williams, Harrison A., Jr. [D-NJ]
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]
Sen. Beall, J. Glenn, Jr. [R-MD]
Sen. Taft, Robert, Jr. [R-OH]
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Labor and Public Welfare08/05/1976 Referred to
08/06/1976 Discharged from
Senate Appropriations08/10/1976 Referred to
08/10/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-1147

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3735. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/10/1976)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

National Influenza Program - Amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Secretary of Health, Education, and Welfare to establish, conduct, and support activities necessary to carry out a national influenza immunization program. Directs the Secretary to make quarterly reports to Congress on the administration of such activities.

Directs the Secretary to conduct a study of the scope and extent of liability for personal injuries arising out of immunization programs and of alternative approaches to providing protection against such liability and compensation for such injuries. Requires the Secretary to report the results of such study, along with legislative recommendations, to Congress within one year of enactment of these provisions.

Makes the United States liable with respect to claims for personal injury or death resulting from the administration of vaccine under the immunization program. Establishes procedures under which all such claims will be asserted directly against the United States and makes such procedures the exclusive legal remedy.