Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Deep Seabed Hard Minerals Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide the Secretary of the Interior with authority to promote the conservation and orderly development of hard mineral resources of the deep seabed, pending adoption of an international regime therefor.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
06/08/1976Reported jointly to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services, S. Rept. 94-935.
06/08/1976Reported jointly to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations, S. Rept. 94-935.
06/08/1976Reported jointly to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, S. Rept. 94-935.
04/14/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-754.
02/18/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
09/15/1976Placed on calendar in Senate under Subjects on the Table.
Action By: Senate
06/08/1976Reported jointly to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services, S. Rept. 94-935.
06/08/1976Reported jointly to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations, S. Rept. 94-935.
06/08/1976Reported jointly to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, S. Rept. 94-935.
04/14/1976Referred jointly to Senate Committees on Armed Services; Commerce; and Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate
04/14/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-754.
02/18/1975Referred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Bartlett, Dewey F. [R-OK]
Sen. Fannin, Paul J. [R-AZ]
Sen. Hansen, Clifford P. [R-WY]
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA]
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]
Sen. Moss, Frank E. [D-UT]

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Interior and Insular Affairs02/18/1975 Referred to
04/14/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-754
Senate Armed Services04/14/1976 Referred to
06/08/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-935
Senate Commerce04/14/1976 Referred to
06/08/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-935
Senate Foreign Relations04/14/1976 Referred to
06/08/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-935

No related bill information was received for S.713.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.713. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (04/14/1976)

(Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-754)

Deep Seabed Hard Minerals Act - Sets forth the findings of Congress and the purposes of the Act. Defines the terms used in the Act. Declares that, with specified exceptions, no person subject to the jurisdiction of the United States shall engage directly or indirectly in the development of hard mineral resources of the deep seabed.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to accept applications from and to issue licenses to eligible applicants upon tender of a fee, to cover administrative costs, for the development of hard mineral resources of the seabed.

Sets forth the provisions for the issuing of such licenses. Declares that in no event shall any license under this Act authorize the commercial recovery of such resources prior to January 1, 1977, and that except to the extent that such licenses are authorized pursuant to the provisions of a future international agreement ratified by the United States establishing a regime for the development of mineral resources of the international seabed area beyond the limits of coastal State territorial or resource jurisdiction, no licenses shall be issued under this Act subsequent to the ratification by the United States of any such international agreement.

Provides that every license issued under this Act shall remain in force for 15 years.

Makes provisions for licensing procedures under this Act. Requires the Secretary of the Interior to establish environmental standards to which operations under licenses issued pursuant to this Act shall adhere.

Sets forth a table of minimum expenditures per licensed block until commercial recovery from such block is initiated.

Authorizes the Secretary to begin commercial recovery and the withdrawal of specified areas from licensing.

Makes the provisions for investment guaranty and insurance through the Secretary of Commerce.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior to harmonize his regulations promulgated under this Act with the regulations and laws of any other State which has acted for purposes and policies similar to those of this Act. Deems such States reciprocating States for the purposes of this Act.

Provides a civil penalty of $10,000 per day during which violations of this Act occur and a criminal penalty of $25,000 per day for willful and knowing violations of this Act.

Authorizes to be appropriated for the current fiscal year and the two succeding fiscal year such sums as may be necessary for the administration of this Act. Declares that if any provision of this Act is held invalid, the validity of the remainder of the Act not be affected thereby.