Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Japan-United States Friendship Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to provide for the use of certain funds to promote scholarly, cultural, and artistic activities between Japan and the United States, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the use of certain funds to promote scholarly, cultural, and artistic activities between Japan and the United States.


Actions Overview (11)

Date
10/20/1975Public law 94-118.
10/20/1975Signed by President.
10/08/1975Measure presented to President.
10/07/1975Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
10/07/1975Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report.
10/02/1975Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-526.
09/26/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 9667.
09/26/1975Committee on International Relations discharged in House.
06/13/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
06/10/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations with amendment, S. Rept. 94-188.
02/25/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
10/20/1975Public law 94-118.
10/20/1975Signed by President.
10/08/1975SenateMeasure presented to President.
10/08/1975Measure enrolled in Senate.
10/08/1975Measure enrolled in House.
10/07/1975SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
10/07/1975HouseHouse agreed to conference report.
10/02/1975HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-526.
09/30/1975HouseConference scheduled in House.
09/29/1975SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
09/26/1975HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 9667.
09/26/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/26/1975HouseCommittee on International Relations discharged in House.
06/16/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on International Relations.
06/13/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
06/13/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/13/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
06/10/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations with amendment, S. Rept. 94-188.
02/25/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations02/25/1975 Referred to
06/10/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-188
House International Relations06/16/1975 Referred to
09/26/1975 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.824. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (10/02/1975)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-526)

Japan-United States Friendship Act - Establishes the Japan-United States Friendship Trust Fund, consisting of amounts to be used for the promotion of scholarly, cultural, and artistic activities between Japan and the United States.

Authorizes appropriations to the Fund, for fiscal year 1976, in an amount equal to 7.5 percent of the total funds payable to the United States pursuant to the Agreement Between Japan and the United States of America Concerning the Ryukyu Islands and the Daito Islands; and those funds available in United States accounts in Japan and transferred by the Government of Japan to the United States pursuant to the United States request made under article V of the agreement between the United States of America and Japan regarding the settlement of Postwar Economic Assistance to Japan, and the exchange of notes thereunder.

Establishes the Japan-United States Friendship Commission, which shall: (1) develop and carry out programs at public or private institutions for the promotion of scholarly, cultural, and artistic activities in Japan and the United States; and (2) make grants to carry out such programs.

Requires the Commission to report annually to the President and the Congress on its activities under this Act.