Summary: S.Con.Res.136 — 94th Congress (1975-1976)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.136. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/31/1976)

Provides for a recess of the Senate from noon on Wednesday, September 1, 1976, to noon on Tuesday, September 7, 1976, and for a recess of the House of Representatives from noon on Thursday, September 2, 1976, to noon on Wednesday, September 8, 1976.