Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution reported authorizing the printing as a Senate document prayers offered during the 93rd Congress.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
05/07/1975Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
04/22/1975Reported to House from the Committee on House Administration, H. Rept. 94-165.
04/14/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
04/10/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-69.
04/10/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/07/1975HouseMeasure passed House.
05/07/1975HouseMeasure considered in House.
05/07/1975HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
04/22/1975HouseReported to House from the Committee on House Administration, H. Rept. 94-165.
04/15/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on House Administration.
04/14/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate.
04/14/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
04/14/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
04/10/1975SenateMeasure placed on calendar in Senate.
04/10/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-69.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration04/15/1975 Referred to
04/22/1975 Reported by H.Rept 94-165
Senate Rules and Administration04/10/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-69

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.31.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.31. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/10/1975)

Authorizes the printing, as a Senate document, of the prayers offered by the Chaplain of the Senate, the Reverend Edward L. R. Elson, S.T.D., during the Ninety third Congress. Authorizes the printing of 2,000 additional copies of the document for the use of the Senate (1,030) and the Joint Committee on Printing (970).