As of 08/01/2021 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.78 - Concurrent resolution disapproving proposed bond issue by the Government of the District of Columbia.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

Concurrent resolution disapproving proposed bond issue by the Government of the District of Columbia.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/05/1975Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, roll call #567 (80-3).
12/04/1975Reported to Senate from the Committee on the District of Columbia, S. Rept. 94-507.
11/20/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/08/1975HouseReferred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
12/05/1975SenateMeasure passed Senate, roll call #567 (80-3).
12/05/1975SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
12/05/1975SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
12/04/1975SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on the District of Columbia, S. Rept. 94-507.
11/20/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on the District of Columbia.

Cosponsors (6)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD]
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]
Sen. Stevenson, Adlai E., III [D-IL]
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]
Sen. Bartlett, Dewey F. [R-OK]
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate District of Columbia11/20/1975 Referred to
12/04/1975 Reported by S.Rept 94-507
House District of Columbia12/08/1975 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.78.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.78. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/20/1975)

Disapproves the Act of the District of Columbia Council entitled "An Act to authorize the issuance of $50,000,000 General Obligation Bonds of the District of Columbia to refund certain loans made to the District from the United States Treasury", passed by the Council of the District of Columbia and signed by the Mayor.