Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to authorize and request the President to issue a proclamation designating July 2, 1976, as an official holiday.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/31/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
03/30/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 94-725.
12/15/1975Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/01/1976HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
03/31/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate.
03/31/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
03/31/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
03/30/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 94-725.
12/15/1975SenateReferred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary12/15/1975 Referred to
03/30/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-725
House Post Office and Civil Service04/01/1976 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.151.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.151. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (12/15/1975)

Authorizes and requests the President to issue a proclamation designating July 2, 1976, as an official holiday. Calls upon all States to encourage individuals to participate in Bicentennial celebrations organized for the weekend of July 4, 1976.