As of 08/03/2021 text has not been received for S.J.Res.163 - A joint resolution to authorize and request the President to issue a proclamation designating the week beginning May 9, 1976, as "National Small Business Week."

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to authorize and request the President to issue a proclamation designating the week beginning May 9, 1976, as "National Small Business Week."


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/06/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
05/05/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 94-776.
02/03/1976Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/07/1976HouseReferred to House Committee Post Office and Civil Service.
05/06/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate.
05/06/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/06/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/05/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 94-776.
02/03/1976SenateReferred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (42)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA]
Sen. Abourezk, James [D-SD]
Sen. Baker, Howard H., Jr. [R-TN]
Sen. Bayh, Birch [D-IN]
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]
Sen. Fannin, Paul J. [R-AZ]
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]
Sen. Griffin, Robert P. [R-MI]
Sen. Hathaway, William D. [D-ME]
Sen. Humphrey, Hubert H. [D-MN]
Sen. Javits, Jacob K. [R-NY]
Sen. McIntyre, Thomas J. [D-NH]
Sen. Mondale, Walter F. [D-MN]
Sen. Montoya, Joseph M. [D-NM]
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI]
Sen. Scott, Hugh [R-PA]
Sen. Sparkman, John J. [D-AL]
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]
Sen. Williams, Harrison A., Jr. [D-NJ]
Sen. Bartlett, Dewey F. [R-OK]
Sen. Brock, Bill [R-TN]
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]
Sen. Clark, Dick [D-IA]
Sen. Morgan, Robert B. [D-NC]
Sen. Tunney, John V. [D-CA]
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]
Sen. Eastland, James O. [D-MS]
Sen. Hansen, Clifford P. [R-WY]
Sen. Hart, Philip A. [D-MI]
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]
Sen. McGee, Gale W. [D-WY]
Sen. McGovern, George [D-SD]
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]
Sen. Moss, Frank E. [D-UT]
Sen. Pastore, John O. [D-RI]
Sen. Tower, John G. [R-TX]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary02/03/1976 Referred to
05/05/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-776
House Post Office and Civil Service05/07/1976 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.163.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.163. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/03/1976)

Authorizes the President to issue a proclamation designating the week beginning May 9, 1976, as "National Small Business Week", in recognition of the achievements and contributions which small and independent family-farmers and business men and women have made to American society.