Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Technical Provisions Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

Joint resolution to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original joint resolution to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
06/30/1976Public law 94-328.
06/30/1976Signed by President.
06/22/1976Measure presented to President.
06/21/1976Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, in lieu of H.J.Res. 984, roll call #414 (350-0).
06/17/1976Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
06/16/1976Reported to Senate from the Committee on Labor and Public Welfare, S. Rept. 94-954.
06/16/1976Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/30/1976Public law 94-328.
06/30/1976Signed by President.
06/22/1976SenateMeasure presented to President.
06/22/1976Measure enrolled in Senate.
06/22/1976Measure enrolled in House.
06/21/1976HouseMeasure passed House, in lieu of H.J.Res. 984, roll call #414 (350-0).
06/21/1976HouseMeasure considered in House.
06/21/1976HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
06/17/1976SenateMeasure passed Senate.
06/17/1976SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/17/1976SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
06/16/1976SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Labor and Public Welfare, S. Rept. 94-954.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Labor and Public Welfare06/16/1976 Reported by S.Rept 94-954

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.203. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/16/1976)

Emergency Technical Provisions Act - Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 by extending until September 30, 1976 (presently ends June 30, 1975), programs of low-interest insured loans to students in institutions of higher education.

Extends appropriations for the Emergency Insured Student Loan Act of 1969 until October 1, 1976 (presently ends June 30, 1975). Provides that any institution of higher education which distributes funds pursuant to the Higher Education Act of 1965 shall not be deemed a contractor.