Summary: S.Res.54 — 94th Congress (1975-1976)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/30/1975)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Extends the Select Committee on Nutrition and Human Needs established by S. Res. 281, Ninetieth Congress, through February 19, 1976.

Authorizes the Select Committee on Nutrition and Human Needs, in studying matters pertaining to the lack of food, medical assistance, and other related necessities of life and health, from March 1, 1975, through February 28, 1976, in its discretion: (1) to make expenditures from the contingent fund of the Senate, (2) to employ personnel, (3) to subpena witnesses and documents, (4) with the prior consent of the Government department or agency concerned and the Committee on Rules and Administration, to use on a reimbursable basis the services of personnel, information, and facilities of any such department or agency, (5) to procure the temporary services (not in excess of one year) or intermittent services of individual consultants, or organizations thereof, (6) to interview employees of the Federal, State, and local governments and other individuals, and (7) to take depositions and other testimony.

Provides that the minority shall receive fair consideration in the appointment of staff personnel pursuant to this resolution.

Limits the expenses of the committee under this resolution to $399,500.

Declares the office of U.S. Senator from the State of New Hampshire for the term commencing January 12, 1975, vacant as of August 8, 1975.