Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fishery Conservation Amendments Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Fishery Conservation Amendments Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to authorize appropriations to carry out the Fishery Conservation and Management Act of 1976 during fiscal year 1979, to provide for the regulation of foreign fish processing vessels in the fishery conservation zone, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations to carry out the Fishery Conservation and Management Act of 1976 during fiscal years 1979, 1980, and 1981.


Actions Overview (11)

Date Actions Overview
08/28/1978Public Law 95-354.
08/28/1978Signed by President.
08/16/1978Measure presented to President.
08/10/1978Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment.
08/04/1978Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment.
07/11/1978Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment (provisions of H. R. 13340 included as passed House on 7/11/78.
06/14/1978Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended (included similar provisions to S. 3050).
05/12/1978Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation with amendment, S. Rept. 95-815.
04/10/1978Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #204 (329-55).
03/31/1978Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1024.
02/02/1978Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/28/1978Public Law 95-354.
08/28/1978Signed by President.
08/16/1978HouseMeasure presented to President.
08/15/1978Measure enrolled in Senate.
08/15/1978Measure enrolled in House.
08/10/1978HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendment.
08/04/1978SenateSenate agreed to House amendment with an amendment.
07/11/1978HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment (provisions of H. R. 13340 included as passed House on 7/11/78.
06/14/1978SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended (included similar provisions to S. 3050).
06/14/1978SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/14/1978SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/12/1978SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation with amendment, S. Rept. 95-815.
04/11/1978SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
04/10/1978HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #204 (329-55).
04/10/1978HouseMeasure considered in House.
04/10/1978HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
03/31/1978HouseReported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1024.
02/02/1978HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
02/02/1978HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (24)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries02/02/1978 Referred to
03/31/1978 Reported by H.Rept 95-1024
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation04/11/1978 Referred to
05/12/1978 Reported by S.Rept 95-815

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.10732. View summaries

Shown Here:
Senate agreed to House amendment with amendment (08/04/1978)

(Senate agreed to House amendments with an amendment)

Amends the Fishery Conservation and Management Act of 1976 to include within the definition of fishing under such Act fish processing at sea. Defines the terms United States fish processors and United States harvested fish for purposes of such Act.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury, in cooperation with the Secretaries of Commerce and State, to report to Congress and to the President on all allocations of United States fish to foreign nations and all trade barriers imposed by such nations.

Sets forth specific information that is to be included in each preliminary fishery management plan.

Revises certain fishing permit requirements for specified foreign fish processing ships at sea in certain United States' fisheries.

Disallows foreign processing of United States harvested fish if United States fish processors have adequate capacity to process such fish.

Prohibits the transfer of United States harvested fish to any foreign ship, within the United States' fishery conservation zone, not having the fishing permit required by such Act.