Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 10, United States Code, to provide that a member of the Board of Regents of the Uniformed Services University of the Health Sciences whose term of office has expired shall continue to serve until a successor is appointed.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
11/04/1978Public Law 95-589.
11/04/1978Signed by President.
10/24/1978Measure presented to President.
10/14/1978Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
10/10/1978Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
10/03/1978Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 95-1685.
08/16/1978Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/04/1978Public Law 95-589.
11/04/1978Signed by President.
10/24/1978HouseMeasure presented to President.
10/14/1978SenateMeasure passed Senate.
10/14/1978SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
10/14/1978SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
10/10/1978HouseMeasure passed House.
10/10/1978HouseMeasure considered in House.
10/10/1978HouseMeasure called up by consent calendar in House.
10/03/1978HouseReported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 95-1685.
08/16/1978HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
08/16/1978HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services08/16/1978 Referred to
10/03/1978 Reported by H.Rept 95-1685

No related bill information was received for H.R.13903.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.13903. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/16/1978)

Stipulates that a member of the Board of Regents of the Uniformed Services University of the Health Sciences whose term of office has expired shall continue to serve until a successor is appointed.