Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to authorize appropriations during the fiscal year 1978, for procurement of aircraft, missiles, naval vessels, tracked combat vehicles, torpedoes, and other weapons, and research, development, test, and evaluation for the Armed Forces, and to prescribe the authorized personnel strength for each active duty component and of the Selected Reserve of each Reserve component of the Armed Forces and the civilian personnel of the Department of Defense, to authorize the military training student loads, and to authorize appropriations for civil defense, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations during the fiscal year 1978, for procurement of aircraft, missiles, naval vessels, tracked combat vehicles, torpedoes, and other weapons, and research, development, test, and evaluation for the Armed Forces, and to prescribe the authorized personnel strength for each active duty component and of the Selected Reserve of each Reserve component of the Armed Forces and of civilian personnel of the Department of Defense, and to authorize the military training student loads.


Actions Overview (12)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/1977Public Law 95-79.
07/30/1977Signed by President.
07/20/1977Measure presented to President.
07/14/1977Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
07/13/1977Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report, roll call #409 (350-40).
06/21/1977Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 95-282.
06/20/1977Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-446.
05/17/1977Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #144 (90-3).
05/10/1977Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 95-129.
04/25/1977Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #151 (347-43).
04/07/1977Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 95-194.
04/04/1977Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/30/1977Public Law 95-79.
07/30/1977Signed by President.
07/20/1977HouseMeasure presented to President.
07/19/1977Measure enrolled in Senate.
07/19/1977Measure enrolled in House.
07/14/1977SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
07/13/1977HouseHouse agreed to conference report, roll call #409 (350-40).
06/21/1977SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 95-282.
06/20/1977HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-446.
05/23/1977HouseConference scheduled in House.
05/17/1977SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
05/17/1977SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #144 (90-3).
05/17/1977SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/16/1977SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/16/1977SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
05/10/1977SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 95-129.
04/26/1977SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.
04/25/1977HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #151 (347-43).
04/25/1977HouseMeasure considered in House.
04/22/1977HouseMeasure considered in House.
04/21/1977HouseMeasure considered in House.
04/21/1977HouseMeasure called up by special rule in House.
04/07/1977HouseReported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 95-194.
04/04/1977HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
04/04/1977HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Wilson, Robert C. [R-CA-41]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/04/1977 Referred to
04/07/1977 Reported by H.Rept 95-194
Senate Armed Services04/26/1977 Referred to
05/10/1977 Reported by S.Rept 95-129

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5970. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (06/20/1977)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-446)

Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act - =Title I: Procurement= - Authorizes appropriations in specified amounts for fiscal year 1978 for the procurement of aircraft, missiles, naval vessels, tracked combat vehicles, torpedoes, and other weapons for the armed forces.

=Title II: Research, Development, Test, and Evaluation= - Authorizes appropriations for fiscal year 1978 for military research, development, test, and evaluation for the armed forces and the defense agencies. Directs the Secretary of the Army to formulate a plan for the protection of certain combat vehicles against chemical and radiological agents.

=Title III: Active Forces= - Prescribes the authorized end strength for active duty personnel in the various components of the armed forces for fiscal year 1978.

Adjusts the pay of cadets and midshipmen.

=Title IV: Reserve Forces= - Prescribes the average strength for the Selected Reserve components of each of the armed forces. Provides for certain recruiting and reenlistment incentives.

=Title V: Civilian Personnel= - Prescribes the authorized end strength for civilian personnel within the Department of Defense. Authorizes the Secretary to increase the number of civilian personnel prescribed under this Act if such action is necessary in the national interest. Stipulates that such increase shall not exceed one and one-quarter percent of the level authorized under this Act.

=Title VI: Military Training Student Loads= - Prescribes the authorized average military training student load for the various components of the armed forces for fiscal year 1978.

=Title VII: Civil Defense= - Authorizes appropriations for fiscal year 1978 to carry out the provisions of the Federal Civil Defense Act of 1950 for programs of the Defense Civil Preparedness Agency.

=Title VIII: General Provisions= - Extends, to October 1, 1979, the authority for the President to transfer to Israel such aircraft as may be necessary to counteract past, present or future assistance furnished to other countries of the Middle East.

Prohibits the expenditure of appropriated funds for advertising the Special Discharge Review Program for certain individuals who served during the Vietnam era.

Reduces the authorized level of generals and admirals over a three year period beginning with fiscal year 1978. Reduces the number of authorized civilian employees in General Schedule grades GS-13 through GS-18.

Requires the Secretary of Defense to report to Congress setting forth quantifiable and measurable material combat readiness requirements for U.S. armed forces and any projected changes in such requirements.

Amends the Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act, 1976 to require the Secretary to report to Congress concerning the impact on U.S. force readiness of any foreign sale or transfer of defense articles exceeding $25,000,000 in value.