There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

International Safe Container Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to establish uniform structural requirements for intermodal cargo containers, subject to the jurisdiction of the United States, designed to be transported interchangeably by sea and land carriers, and moving in, or designed to move in, international trade, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to establish uniform structural requirements for intermodal cargo containers, subject to the jurisdiction of the United States, designed to be transported interchangeably by sea and land carriers, and moving in, or designed to move in, international trade.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
12/13/1977Public Law 95-208.
12/13/1977Signed by President.
12/13/1977Became Law No. 95-208
12/01/1977Measure presented to President.
11/29/1977Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment.
11/04/1977Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended (inserted text of S. 1597 as passed in Senate).
11/04/1977Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged in Senate.
11/01/1977Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
10/12/1977Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 95-693 (Part I).
06/30/1977Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/13/1977Public Law 95-208.
12/13/1977Signed by President.
12/13/1977Became Law No. 95-208
12/01/1977HouseMeasure presented to President.
12/01/1977Measure enrolled in Senate.
12/01/1977Measure enrolled in House.
11/29/1977HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendment.
11/04/1977SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended (inserted text of S. 1597 as passed in Senate).
11/04/1977SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
11/04/1977SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged in Senate.
11/03/1977SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
11/01/1977HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
11/01/1977HouseMeasure considered in House.
11/01/1977HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
10/12/1977HouseReported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 95-693 (Part I).
06/30/1977HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
06/30/1977HouseReferred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
06/30/1977HouseReferred to House Committee on International Relations.
06/30/1977HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-10]
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7]
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-12]
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2]
Rep. Eilberg, Joshua [D-PA-4]
Del. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]
Rep. Zeferetti, Leo C. [D-NY-15]
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]
Rep. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA-1]

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House International Relations06/30/1977 Referred to
House Interstate and Foreign Commerce06/30/1977 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries06/30/1977 Referred to
10/12/1977 Reported by H.Rept 95-693 Part 1
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation11/03/1977 Referred to
11/04/1977 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.8159. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/04/1977)

(Measure passed Senate, amended (inserted text of S. 1597 as passed in Senate))

International Safe Container Act - Requires the Secretary of Transportation on and after the date the International Convention for Safe Containers enters into force for the United States to enforce and carry out the provisions of the Convention.

Sets forth the duties of owners of containers, concerning approval and examination of containers.

Directs the Secretary of Transportation to prescribe regulations regarding: (1) procedures for the testing, inspection, and initial approval of existing and new containers and of designs for new containers, including procedures relating to the affixing, invalidating, and removal of safety approval plates for containers; (2) procedures to be followed by owners of containers relating to the periodic examination of containers, as provided in the Convention; and (3) a method for developing, collecting, and disseminating data concerning container safety and the international transport of containers.

Allows the Secretary to: (1) authorize the affixation of a safety approval plate to any container which, after examination, is not found to have a safety approval plate attached to it and which the owner has established meets the standards of the Convention; (2) delegate and withdraw the delegation of authority to initially approve existing and new containers and designs for new containers, and to authorize the affixing of a safety approval plate; and (3) establish a schedule of fees to be charged and collected for services related to the testing inspection, end initial approval of containers and container designs.

Permits the Secretary to take action to ensure compliance with the Act. Provides that, beginning on the fifth anniversary of the date the convention enters into force for the United States, the Secretary may examine or require to be examined any existing container in international transport.

Authorizes the Secretary to issue detention or other necessary orders for containers not having valid safety approval plates. Establishes civil penalties for moving containers in violation of a detention order.

Prohibits discrimination against employees who have reported the existence of an unsafe container or who have reported violations of this Act.

Authorizes the Secretary of State, in conjunction with the Secretary of Transportation, to propose amendments to the Convention or to request a conference to amend the Convention.

Authorizes appropriations in such amounts as may be necessary to carry out the provisions of this Act.