Summary: H.R.8729 — 95th Congress (1977-1978)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/14/1978)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Aircraft and Airport Noise Reduction Act - =Title I:= Directs the Secretary of Transportation to establish a single system of measuring noise and the impact of noise on individuals to be used to measure noise at airports and their surrounding areas and to establish land uses for such areas which are compatible with such noise levels. Allows airport operators to submit noise impact maps to the Secretary setting forth the noncompatible uses in each area of the map, a description of the projected aircraft operations during 1985, and the ways in which such operations will affect such map. Requires the revision of such maps when changes in airports operations would create any new noncompatible use in areas surrounding an airport.

Amends the Airport and Airway Development Act to authorize the Secretary to make grants to qualified airports for noise compatibility planning. Defines "noise compatibility planning" as the preparation of noise impact maps and noise compatibility programs under this Act. Sets forth limitation regarding the amounts which may be obligated through such grant program.

Authorizes appropriations of $15,000,000 for each of the fiscal years 1979 and beyond to carry out such grant program.

Stipulates that noise compatibility programs filed with the Secretary pursuant to this Act shall include measures proposed by a airport operators for the reduction of existing noncompatible uses and the prevention of the introduction of additional noncompatible uses with the area covered by the operator's noise impact map.

Sets forth factors which the Secretary is to rely on in approving or disapproving noise compatibility programs. Stipulates that the Federal share of an approved program shall be 80 percent of its cost. Authorizes the Secretary to make additional grants to operators of airports for projects to carry out a noise compatibility program developed prior to the enactment of this Act or the promulgation of its implementing regulations under specified conditions.

Authorizes appropriations for each of the fiscal years 1979 and 1980 to carry out such grant program.

Authorizes the Secretary to make loans to airport operators for the purpose of acquiring real property impacted by aircraft noise in accordance with an approved noise compatibility plan. Stipulates that such a loan may not exceed 80 percent of the cost of the real property acquired.

Establishes within the Treasury the Aircraft Noise Impacted Real Property Acquisition Revolving Loan Fund to fund such loan program through fiscal year 1990. Requires the transfer of $300,000,000 from the Airport and Airway Trust Fund to such fund at the close of fiscal year 1979. Stipulates that any balance in the fund after 1995 shall revert to the Airport and Airway Trust Fund.

Requires the Secretary to prepare impact noise maps and noise compatibility programs for specified airports near the District of Columbia.

Places additional legal proof requirements on a person suing for damages as a result of airport noise.

Directs the Secretary to conduct a study on the means available for achieving maximum feasible airport noise-land use compatibility, in terms of those regulations promulgated under this Act to identify land uses normally compatible with various impacts of noise on individuals, toward a goal of full compatibility by January 1, 2000. Requires the Secretary to determine the most efficient and effective means for obtaining funds for achieving such maximum feasible compatibility.

Requires the Secretary to submit an interim progress memorandum and a report on such study, together with recommendations for legislation required to implement such maximum feasible compatibility programs.

=Title II:= Increases specified appropriations authorized for fiscal years 1979 and 1980 under the Airport and Airway Development Act of 1970. Increases the Federal share of an approved project under such Act for fiscal years 1979 and 1980 from a required 80 percent to a maximum allowable 90 percent of its cost.

=Title III:= Directs the Secretary to publish a list of operators of United States civil subsonic turbojet powered aircraft above a specified weight which do not comply with noise standards prescribed for new subsonic aircraft in regulations issued by the Secretary and in effect on January 1, 1977.

Authorizes the Secretary to waive noise requirements for the operation of two-or three-engine noncomplying aircraft beyond January 1, 1985, if the operator has entered into a binding contract by January 1, 1983, for the purchase of a replacement aircraft which meets the noise standards for new aircraft set forth in regulations on March 2, 1978.

Authorizes the Secretary to provide waivers from the noise regulations in effect on January 1, 1977, where the operator has made a good faith effort to comply with such regulations for such a period as the Secretary determines to be reasonable to permit compliance.

=Title IV:= Reduces the passenger ticket tax for domestic air transportation from eight percent to six percent from October 1, 1979, to July 1, 1980.

Changes the international head tax for use of international air travel facilities where a noise abatement charge is in effect for a period of ten years from a three dollar tax to a one dollar tax.

Reduces the tax on the transportation of property by air from five percent to three percent from October 1, 1979, to July 1, 1980.

=Title V:= Changes from September 30, 1978, to September 30, 1980, the date after which the Secretary shall not make a grant to any State to manage a demonstration program for administering Federal grants for general aviation airports in that State.