Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A concurrent resolution revising the congressional budget for the U.S. Government for the fiscal year l978.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
09/15/1977Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment, roll call #375 (68-21).
09/15/1977Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
09/15/1977Resolving differences -- House actions: Motion to recede and concur in Senate amendment with an amendment passed House, roll call #545 (215-187).
09/13/1977Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 95-428.
09/13/1977Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-601.
09/09/1977Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #361 (63-21), inserted provisions of S. Con. Res. 43.
09/08/1977Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #525 (199-188).
08/05/1977Reported to House from the Committee on the Budget, H. Rept. 95-582.
08/05/1977Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/15/1977SenateSenate agreed to House amendment, roll call #375 (68-21).
09/15/1977SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
09/15/1977HouseMotion to recede and concur in Senate amendment with an amendment passed House, roll call #545 (215-187).
09/13/1977SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 95-428.
09/13/1977HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-601.
09/12/1977HouseConference scheduled in House.
09/09/1977SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
09/09/1977SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #361 (63-21), inserted provisions of S. Con. Res. 43.
09/09/1977SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
09/09/1977SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
09/08/1977HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #525 (199-188).
09/08/1977HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/07/1977HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/07/1977HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
08/05/1977HouseReported to House from the Committee on the Budget, H. Rept. 95-582.
08/05/1977HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Budget08/05/1977 Reported by H.Rept 95-582

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.341. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (09/13/1977)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-601)

Sets forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for the fiscal year 1978. States that the recommended level of Federal revenues is $397,000,000,000 and the amount by which the aggregate level of Federal revenues should be decreased is $1,100,000,000. States that the appropriate level of total new budget authority is $500,100,000,000. Establishes the appropriate level of the public debt at $775,450,000,000.

Sets forth the appropriate level of new budget authority and the estimated budget outlays for each major functional category.