Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A resolution revising the congressional budget for the United States Government for the fiscal year 1979.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
09/23/1978Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment, roll call #397 (47-7).
09/23/1978Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
09/21/1978Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 95-1205.
09/21/1978Resolving differences -- House actions: House receded and concurred in Senate amendment with an amendment, roll call #811 (225-162).
09/20/1978Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-1594.
09/06/1978Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. Con. Res. 104, roll call #372 (56-18).
09/06/1978Committee on the Budget discharged in Senate.
08/16/1978Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #713 (217-178).
08/08/1978Reported to House from the Committee on the Budget, H. Rept. 95-1456.
08/08/1978Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/23/1978SenateSenate agreed to House amendment, roll call #397 (47-7).
09/23/1978SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
09/21/1978SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 95-1205.
09/21/1978HouseHouse receded and concurred in Senate amendment with an amendment, roll call #811 (225-162).
09/20/1978HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-1594.
09/14/1978SenateMotion to instruct Senate conferees passed Senate (See S. Res. 562).
09/08/1978SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
09/07/1978HouseConference scheduled in House.
09/06/1978SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. Con. Res. 104, roll call #372 (56-18).
09/06/1978SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
09/06/1978SenateCommittee on the Budget discharged in Senate.
08/17/1978SenateReferred to Senate Committee on the Budget.
08/16/1978HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #713 (217-178).
08/16/1978HouseMeasure considered in House.
08/15/1978HouseMeasure considered in House.
08/15/1978HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
08/08/1978HouseReported to House from the Committee on the Budget, H. Rept. 95-1456.
08/08/1978HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Budget08/17/1978 Referred to
09/06/1978 Discharged from
House Budget08/08/1978 Reported by H.Rept 95-1456

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.683. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in Senate (09/21/1978)

(Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 95-1205)

Sets forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal year 1979. States that the recommended level of Federal revenues is $448,700,000,000, and the appropriate level of total budget outlays is $487,500,000,000. States that the amount by which the aggregate level of Federal revenues should be decreased is $21,900,000,000, and that the appropriate level of total new budget authority is $555,650,000,000. Establishes the appropriate level of the public debt at $836,000,000,000.

Sets forth the appropriate level of new budget authority and the estimated budget outlays for each major functional category.

Sets forth the Education, Training, Employment and Social Services function at $32,900,000,000 for new budget authority and $30,300,000,000 for outlays.

Sets forth the General Purpose Fiscal Assistance function at $8,800,000,000 for new budget authority and $8,800,000,000 for outlays.