Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An Act to amend title 10, United States Code, to abolish one of the two positions of Deputy Secretary of Defense and establish the position of Under Secretary of Defense for Policy and to change the title of the Director of Defense Research and Engineering to the Under Secretary of Defense for Research and Engineering.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend titles 10 and 5, United States Code, to disestablish one of the positions of Deputy Secretary of Defense and establish an Under Secretary of Defense for Policy.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/21/1977Public Law 95-140.
10/21/1977Signed by President.
10/12/1977Measure presented to President.
10/06/1977Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments.
09/19/1977Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
07/21/1977Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 95-519.
06/09/1977Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
05/27/1977Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 95-234.
04/25/1977Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/21/1977Public Law 95-140.
10/21/1977Signed by President.
10/12/1977SenateMeasure presented to President.
10/12/1977Measure enrolled in Senate.
10/12/1977Measure enrolled in House.
10/06/1977SenateSenate agreed to House amendments.
09/19/1977HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
09/19/1977HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/19/1977HouseMeasure called up by consent calendar in House.
07/21/1977HouseReported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 95-519.
06/10/1977HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
06/09/1977SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
06/09/1977SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/09/1977SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
06/08/1977SenatePlaced on calendar in Senate under Measures Cleared to be Considered by Unanimous Consent.
05/27/1977SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 95-234.
04/25/1977SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Anderson, Wendell R. [D-MN]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services04/25/1977 Referred to
05/27/1977 Reported by S.Rept 95-234
House Armed Services06/10/1977 Referred to
07/21/1977 Reported by H.Rept 95-519

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1372. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (07/21/1977)

(Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 95-519)

Abolishes one of the two present positions of Deputy Secretary of Defense within the Department of Defense.

Establishes an Under Secretary of Defense for Policy. Renames the present position of Director of Defense for Research and Engineering as the Under Secretary of Defense for Research and Engineering. Provides that these officials be appointed from civilian life by the President with the advice and consent of the Senate. Stipulates that no person may be appointed Under Secretary of Defense for Policy who has served as a commissioned officer of an armed force within the last ten years.