Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Accounting and Auditing Act of 1950 to provide for the audit, by the Comptroller General, of the Internal Revenue Service and of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, and Firearms.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/07/1977Public Law 95-125.
10/07/1977Signed by President.
09/29/1977Measure presented to President.
09/27/1977Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, roll call #599 (402-5).
07/01/1977Reported to House from the Committee on Government Operations, H. Rept. 95-480.
03/11/1977Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
03/09/1977Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-42.
01/14/1977Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/07/1977Public Law 95-125.
10/07/1977Signed by President.
09/29/1977SenateMeasure presented to President.
09/28/1977Measure enrolled in Senate.
09/28/1977Measure enrolled in House.
09/27/1977HouseMeasure passed House, roll call #599 (402-5).
09/27/1977HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/27/1977HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
07/01/1977HouseReported to House from the Committee on Government Operations, H. Rept. 95-480.
03/14/1977HouseReferred to House Committee on Government Operations.
03/11/1977SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
03/11/1977SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
03/11/1977SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
03/09/1977SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-42.
01/14/1977SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Government Operations (Subsequently: Governmental Affairs).

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs01/14/1977 Referred to
03/09/1977 Reported by S.Rept 95-42
House Government Operations03/14/1977 Referred to
07/01/1977 Reported by H.Rept 95-480

No related bill information was received for S.213.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.213. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/14/1977)

Requires the Comptroller General to regularly audit the Internal Revenue Service and the Bureau of Alchohol, Tobacco, and Firearms. Provides the Comptroller General with access to tax returns for conducting such audits but requires that no employee or officer of the General Accounting Office may divulge or make known in any manner to any person not a proper employee of such Office any tax return information in a form which can be identified with a particular taxpayer.

Requires the Comptroller General to report annually to Congress with respect to procedures and requirements which he has established with the subjects of his audits for protecting the confidentiality of tax returns and tax return information and any findings or recommendations developed by the Comptroller General including any significant evidence of inefficiency or mismanagement.