Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the investigation to study the feasibility of the Santa Cruz Dam and Reservoir, Santa Cruz Irrigation District, New Mexico, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/11/1978Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
10/06/1978Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1283.
05/26/1978Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
10/12/1978HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
10/11/1978SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
10/11/1978SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
10/11/1978SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
10/06/1978SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1283.
05/26/1978SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/26/1978 Referred to
10/06/1978 Reported by S.Rept 95-1283
House Interior and Insular Affairs10/12/1978 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.3158.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3158. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (10/06/1978)

(Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1283)

Requires the Secretary of the Interior, after October 1, 1979, to make a full investigation and study to determine the feasibility of carrying out a project to rehabilitate and improve the existing Santa Cruz Dam and Reservoir, Santa Cruz Irrigation District, New Mexico. Directs the Secretary to consider the potential for developing the Santa Cruz Dam and Reservoir as a unit or part of the San Juan-Chama project.

Authorizes necessary appropriations to carry out the provisions of this Act.