Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • Native Hawaiian Education Act
  • Native Hawaiian Elementary and Secondary School Assistance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Hawaiian Native Educational Assistance Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Indian and Native Hawaiian Elementary and Secondary School Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Indian Education Act and certain other related education assistance programs to provide Federal financial assistance to Hawaiian natives, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/13/1978Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
09/19/1978Reported to Senate from the Select Committee on Indian Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1199.
03/02/1977Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
10/14/1978HouseReferred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
10/13/1978SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
10/13/1978SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
10/13/1978SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
09/19/1978SenateReported to Senate from the Select Committee on Indian Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1199.
03/02/1977SenateReferred to Senate Select Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs03/02/1977 Referred to
09/19/1978 Reported by S.Rept 95-1199
House Education and Labor10/14/1978 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.857. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/19/1978)

(Reported to Senate from the Select Committee on Indian Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1199)

Native Hawaiian Education Act - Amends the Act of September 30, 1950 by adding an additional title: =Title IV: Financial Assistance to Local Educational Agencies for the Education of Native Hawaiian Children= - Native Hawaiian Elementary and Secondary School Assistance Act. Directs the Commissioner of Education to determine the number of native Hawaiians enrolled in local educational agencies for the purpose of computing the amount of grants to such agencies. Stipulates that the amount to which such agency is entitled is based on the number of native Hawaiian students.

Directs that the funds are to be used for the planning, development, and operation of programs designed to meet the special educational needs of native Hawaiians. Sets forth procedures for applications and the conditions that must be met.

Requires the creation of committees composed primarily of Hawaiian parents of school children to approve local educational agency applications.

Provides for payments to local educational agencies on a cost reimbursable basis. Allows adjustments in payments where appropriations are not sufficient to pay the full entitlement.

Amends Title VIII of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act to provide grants to native Hawaiian organizations and State and local educational agencies to support projects designed to improve educational opportunities for native Hawaiian students by testing, developing new programs, training teachers, and disseminating information concerning education programs. Sets forth application procedures and authorizes appropriations for such grants. Authorizes the Commissioner to award fellowships for undergraduate and graduate degrees for native Hawaiians.

Amends the Adult Education Act to provide grants to native Hawaiian organizations and local educational agencies to support projects designed: (1) to test and demonstrate the effectiveness of adult education programs for native Hawaiians; (2) to disseminate information concerning such programs; and (3) to evaluate such programs. Sets forth the application procedures and authorizes appropriations for such grants.

Directs the Office of Indian Education to administer this Act.

Establishes an Advisory Council on Native Hawaiian Education to advise the Commissioner, review applications for assistance, and evaluate programs under this Act.