Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution authorizing the printing of additional copies of Volumes 1 and 2 of the committee print entitled, "A Legislative History of the Water Pollution Control Act Amendments of 1972."


Actions Overview (5)

Date
09/26/1978Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
09/19/1978Reported to House from the Committee on House Administration, H. Rept. 95-1582.
06/23/1978Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
06/22/1978Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 95-945.
06/08/1978Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
09/26/1978HouseMeasure passed House.
09/26/1978HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/26/1978HouseMeasure called up by consent calendar in House.
09/19/1978HouseReported to House from the Committee on House Administration, H. Rept. 95-1582.
06/26/1978HouseReferred to House Committee on House Administration.
06/23/1978SenateMeasure passed Senate.
06/23/1978SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/23/1978SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
06/22/1978SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 95-945.
06/08/1978SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration06/08/1978 Referred to
06/22/1978 Reported by S.Rept 95-945
House Administration06/26/1978 Referred to
09/19/1978 Reported by H.Rept 95-1582

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.90.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.90. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/08/1978)

Authorizes the printing of 1,000 copies of volumes 1 and 2 of the Senate committee print of the 93rd Congress entitled "A Legislative History of the Water Pollution Control Act Amendments of 1972."