Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to restore posthumously full rights of citizenship to Jefferson F. Davis.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/17/1978Public Law 95-466.
10/17/1978Signed by President.
10/05/1978Measure presented to President.
10/03/1978Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments.
09/26/1978Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.J. Res. 1041.
09/26/1978Committee on the Judiciary discharged in House.
04/27/1977Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
04/22/1977Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 95-100.
01/25/1977Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/17/1978Public Law 95-466.
10/17/1978Signed by President.
10/05/1978Measure enrolled in Senate.
10/05/1978SenateMeasure presented to President.
10/05/1978Measure enrolled in House.
10/03/1978SenateSenate agreed to House amendments.
09/26/1978HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.J. Res. 1041.
09/26/1978HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/26/1978HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged in House.
04/28/1977HouseReferred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/27/1977SenateMeasure passed Senate.
04/27/1977SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
04/27/1977SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
04/26/1977SenatePlaced on calendar in Senate under Measures Cleared to be Considered by Unanimous Consent.
04/22/1977SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 95-100.
01/25/1977SenateReferred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (2)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/25/1977 Referred to
04/22/1977 Reported by S.Rept 95-100
House Judiciary04/28/1977 Referred to
09/26/1978 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.16. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/25/1977)

Restores posthumously full rights of United States citizenship to Jefferson Davis, effective December 5, 1868.