Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to initiate preliminary studies for the restoration and renovation of the Pension Building in Washington, DC, to house a museum of the building arts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
11/04/1978Public Law 95-596.
11/04/1978Signed by President.
10/25/1978Measure presented to President.
10/14/1978Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
10/12/1978Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1776.
09/15/1978Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
09/11/1978Reported to Senate from the Committee on Environment and Public Works, S. Rept. 95-1181.
09/11/1978Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/04/1978Public Law 95-596.
11/04/1978Signed by President.
10/25/1978SenateMeasure presented to President.
10/14/1978Measure enrolled in Senate.
10/14/1978Measure enrolled in House.
10/14/1978HouseMeasure passed House.
10/14/1978HouseMeasure considered in House.
10/14/1978HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
10/12/1978HouseReported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1776.
09/18/1978HouseReferred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
09/15/1978SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
09/15/1978SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
09/15/1978SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
09/11/1978SenatePlaced on calendar in Senate.
09/11/1978SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Environment and Public Works, S. Rept. 95-1181.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation09/18/1978 Referred to
10/12/1978 Reported by H.Rept 95-1776
Senate Environment and Public Works09/11/1978 Reported by S.Rept 95-1181

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.160.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.160. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (10/12/1978)

(Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1776)

Directs the Administrator of the General Services Administration to submit to Congress a study on the restoration of the Pension Building in the District of Columbia to house the Museum of the Building Arts.

Requests the Chairman of the National Endowment for the Arts and the Secretary of the Smithsonian Institution to report to Congress by January 1, 1979, on the feasibility of operating such a museum.